U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-04038
  • Case Name: AALFS Family Partnership et al v. GSL Holdings, SA de CV et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 09, 2022: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 21, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.