U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00077
  • Case Name: Grankin v. Quad City Symphony Orchestra Assocation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 22, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 21, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 21, 2021: [Complaint]
  • September 21, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.