U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Thiel Truck Center, Inc. v. Brooke Jewell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 15, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 15, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • February 09, 2022: [Errata]
  • February 08, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 02, 2022: [Brief /Other]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Affidavit in Opposition]
  • January 28, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Claim]
  • January 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 27, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 27, 2022: [Claim]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice - Other]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 17, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • September 24, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • September 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.