U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Griesenbeck et al v. Davenport Community School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Reply]
  • November 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 29, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 08, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • October 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.