U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00333
  • Case Name: Tyson v. Iowa Prison Industries Canteen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • November 01, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.