U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Leveke v. Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 07, 2022: [TRO]
  • January 07, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • November 23, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 12, 2021: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 09, 2021: [Errata]
  • November 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 05, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • November 03, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.