U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00346
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $2,207.00 in U.S. Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 08, 2022: [Default Entry by Clerk]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice - Other]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Writ Issued]
  • November 05, 2021: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • November 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.