U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00355
  • Case Name: Vice v. Lee County Sheriff Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [USCA Order]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.