U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00356
  • Case Name: Pladsen v. State of Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 05, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice - Other]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 14, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2022: [Letter]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.