U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Williams v. City of Burlington, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Create Case Association]
  • April 27, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 26, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 25, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Reply]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 16, 2022: [Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 02, 2021: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 01, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.