U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00372
  • Case Name: Cory v. Karberg
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • August 08, 2022: [Brief /Other]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief /Other]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • February 28, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • February 28, 2022: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • February 28, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • February 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 01, 2021: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.