U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Huntsman v. Exile Brewing Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice - Other]
  • January 11, 2023: [Certify Questions of Law]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Status Report Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 24, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 16, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • May 13, 2022: [Reply]
  • May 10, 2022: [Settlement/Settlement Conference]
  • May 09, 2022: [Seal]
  • May 09, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 26, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 22, 2022: [Seal]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 16, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 16, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 11, 2022: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 11, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 08, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.