U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00075
  • Case Name: Cervantes v. CRST International, Inc. et al -- PER #271 ORDER RESET SCHEDULING ORDER DDL WHEN CLASS MOTION RULED ON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 28, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Compel]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.