U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Andrade et al v. JBS USA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 29, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Stay]
  • June 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 01, 2022: [Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Remand to State Court]
  • May 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Errata]
  • May 16, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 16, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.