U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Lajeunesse v. Karberg
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2023: [Brief /Other]
  • January 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 07, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • October 19, 2022: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • October 18, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • October 18, 2022: [Add Party]
  • October 18, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • October 18, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2022: [Strike]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice - Other]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply]
  • September 02, 2022: [Reply]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • August 19, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 19, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 17, 2022: [Strike]
  • August 15, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 11, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 10, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • August 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • August 04, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 04, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 04, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 04, 2022: [Errata]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • August 04, 2022: [Submission of State Court Documents (Attorney General only)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • July 27, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 20, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2022: [Reply]
  • July 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • June 22, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 16, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • June 08, 2022: [Add Party]
  • June 06, 2022: [Initial Review Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 02, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 13, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.