U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00167
  • Case Name: Magallon v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Brief /Other]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Affidavit]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 23, 2022: [Initial Review Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.