U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Simmons v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 25, 2023: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 27, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • December 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 27, 2022: [Reconsideration]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Brief /Other]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 11, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 28, 2022: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • September 26, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2022: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.