U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Jacques v. Union County, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice - Other]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 09, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 20, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.