U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00170
  • Case Name: Carr v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Reconsideration]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.