U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Egemo v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sealed Document]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • October 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 26, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Certificate]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 13, 2022: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Errata]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.