U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Blessins v. United States Postal Service et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 18, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 18, 2022: [Substitute Party]
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • November 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [Default Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 14, 2022: [More Definite Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 26, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • July 28, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.