U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00398
  • Case Name: United States of America v. State of Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice - Other]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2022: [Entry of Consent Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.