U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00400
  • Case Name: Fremont Farms of Iowa LLP v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 12, 2023: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.