U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Christian Life Center of Newton v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Stipulation]
  • January 13, 2023: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • December 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 05, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 02, 2022: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.