U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00406
  • Case Name: Hilzendeger v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 12, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 09, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • December 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.