U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00409
  • Case Name: Shafer v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 09, 2023: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 05, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 05, 2022: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.