U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00104
  • Case Name: JF Acquisition, LLC v. Seneca Companies, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 25, 2025: [Seal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 24, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.