U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00107
  • Case Name: Hoehn v. Sysco Iowa, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.