U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00476
  • Case Name: Brandon A. Thompson and Melissa A. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Generic Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [zGeneric Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F. [Proceeding Memo]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.