U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00477-7
  • Case Name: William M. Pugh, III and Jamie R. Pugh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Debtor's (for Joint Debtor only) Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Notice Request]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [none]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Employee Income Record]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Record]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.