U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00482-lmj13
  • Case Name: Kevin D Wesack and Lori A Wesack
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Bar Date - 14 day]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Relief from Stay - Order]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Judge Jackwig Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Bar Date - 7 day]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Relief from Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Objection to Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Report of 341 Meeting (Module)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor's (for Joint Debtor only) Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [341 Meeting - Ch13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [notice of bar date - Plan Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [none]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Corrective Entry]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Employee Income Record]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Chapter 13 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (122C-1)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.