U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00512-lmj7
  • Case Name: Amber Rose Horvath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Module)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Notice Request]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [none]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Employee Income Record]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.