U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00514-lmj7
  • Case Name: Julia Sue Campbell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Notice of Bar Date - 14 day]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Stipulated Motion Re: Rule 4001(d) (1), (2), (3) (not (4))]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Module)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Notice of Corrected Creditor Address]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [none]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Declaration Re: No Employee Income Record]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.