U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00529-lmj7
  • Case Name: Kathy Lynn Hunley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Statement of Intentions]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Amended 341 Meeting]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Resignation of Trustee]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Resignation of Trustee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule J]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule I]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule H]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule G]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule E/F]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule D]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule C]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Schedule A/B]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Fees Paid]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gainer, Robert C [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.