U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00515-lmj7
  • Case Name: Charles Philip Barnes
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Module)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Court's Certificate of Service by Mail]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [none]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Dismiss Chapter 7 - Order]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Dismiss Chapter 7]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Object to Discharge Pursuant Only to 11 USC Sec. 727(a)(8), 727(a)(9) or 1328(f)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings - AutoDocket]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.