U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00037-lmj13
  • Case Name: Nicholas Aaron Palmer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Amended Schedules (A/B,C,G,H,I,J)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Bar Date - 30 day]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Objection to Claim]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Corrective Entry]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Chapter 12/13 Trustee Final Report and Account]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Certificate Of Service]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Minute Order]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Withdraw Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Bar Date - 30 day]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dunbar, Carol F [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.