U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00604-7
  • Case Name: Cole M Scott and Marcia S Scott
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Notice Request]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Declaration about Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor's (for Joint Debtor only) Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Certificate Of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Corrective Entry]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Declaration about Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Court's Certificate of Service by Mail]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Amended Schedule Requiring Filing Fee (D,E/F)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Employee Income Record]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Record]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor (for Joint Debtor only) Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Smith, Charles [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.