U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morrison
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Exhibit(s)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exhibit(s)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Rule 5 Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Text Order Setting Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.