U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00143
  • Case Name: West Bend Insurance Company et al v. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.