U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue Trial - Central Case]
  • May 07, 2025: [Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Proposed Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 06, 2025: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Proposed Stipulated Discovery and Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 5 Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Setting Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.