U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roop
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report (Sealed)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant of Arrest Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 5 Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA23 - Financial Affidavit (Sealed)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Text Order Setting Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.