U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Doe #1 et al v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Leave]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 23, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 23, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.