U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00671-11
  • Case Name: Handlos Family Farms, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service under 11 USC Sec 366(b)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corrective Entry]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation for Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [341 Meeting - Ch11 - Business]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Joint Administration]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Resolution]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [none]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 11]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.