open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:6:19-cv-01156
    Party Name:United States of America v. Ingram
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Dismiss Complaint/Case]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Dismiss Complaint/Case]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion for Deferred Prosecution]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Deferral of Prosecution]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Pretrial Diversion Agreement]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Court Information Sheet]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arraignment - Petty Offense]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing - Fort Riley]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Violation Notice/Ticket]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?112519
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =