U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-41127
  • Case Name: Gerald Daniel Wecker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • July 20, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Final Decree]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Change of Address]
  • June 20, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Change of Address]
  • June 15, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
  • June 05, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Discharging Debtor(s)]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Certificate of Compliance and Motion for Entry of Discharge]
March, 2022
  • March 06, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 03, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Chapter 13 Plan Completion]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Release Wages]
  • February 21, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Financial Management Course]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 24, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Chapter 13 Trustee Notice of Plan Approaching Completion]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Trustee's Interim Report]
August, 2020
  • August 05, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Trustee's Interim Report]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Change of Address]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Trustee's Interim Report]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Trustee's Interim Report]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Notice to Allow Claims]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Withdraw Document]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • April 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Objection to Claim]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • November 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • September 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [DeBN Request Form]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Employee Income Records]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.