open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:6:19-cr-10025-1
    Party Name:USA v. Arjona et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Change Plea (to court)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expert Testimony]
    Date Published:April 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention Order]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration of Detention Order]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial and Criminal Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Stay of Execution]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay of Execution]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appointing CJA Attorney]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit-CJA 23]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance/Rule 5]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Appearance for Defendant]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?124935
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =