open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-10882
    Party Name:Chad Lee Lorenz and Theresa Lynn Lorenz
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Change of Address]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [AAutoAsignJudge7]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Parks, Linda S [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?255744
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =