open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02469
    Party Name:Lubberts v. Olathe Trading Post, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?127743
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =