open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-41014
    Party Name:Colton David Shuford
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Hearing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Pay Wages (Employer)]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hamilton, Jan [AAutoAsignJudge13]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?257643
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =