open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

KANSAS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02550
    Party Name:United States of America v. Ploussard et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?128283
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =